E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5158 | |
E | 05/28/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4208 | |
House | 05/26/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4991 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3354 | |
Senate | 05/25/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3495 | |
Senate | 05/25/2009 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2893 | |
House | 05/24/2009 | Record vote | RV#1116 | Journal Page: 4584 |
House | 05/24/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 4584 | |
House | 05/24/2009 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 4584 | |
House | 05/22/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/15/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/14/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/14/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3801 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/14/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/14/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/30/2009 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 2207 | |
House | 04/23/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1762 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 1352 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |