S.C.R. No. 64 SENATE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION WHEREAS, Residents of Sabine Pass are gathering on May 3, 2009, to celebrate the 170th anniversary of the founding of their community; and WHEREAS, First settled in the early 1830s, the town of Sabine City was officially established on January 19, 1839, by a charter signed by General Sam Houston; the Sabine City Company began to advertise lots in the town on May 1, 1839, and in 1860, the city changed its name to Sabine Pass; and WHEREAS, In the 1800s, Sabine Pass was a major port on the Gulf of Mexico, an important shipping point for cattle and cotton; during the Civil War, the port was defended by Forts Sabine and Griffin, and the town was the site of the Battle of Sabine Pass on September 8, 1863, when Confederate gunners drove off an attack by four Union gunboats; and WHEREAS, Sabine Pass is the birthplace of Pattillo Higgins, the entrepreneur who helped initiate the Spindletop oil strike in the early 1900s; the town is also the birthplace of J. P. Richardson, the rock 'n' roll star known as the Big Bopper; and WHEREAS, Since 1978, the community has been part of Port Arthur; its economy continues to depend on the oil industry, commercial fishing, and marine repair; and WHEREAS, Throughout the years, Sabine Pass has been hit hard by hurricanes; an 1886 storm killed 86 people and almost destroyed the town, and Hurricanes Rita, Humberto, Gustav, and Ike are responsible for more recent damage; after each devastating event, however, the people of Sabine Pass have come together to rebuild and restore the vitality of their community; and WHEREAS, The hardy spirit of Sabine Pass remains strong, and its citizens may indeed take pride in their rich history as they celebrate a notable milestone; now, therefore, be it RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas hereby commemorate the 170th anniversary of the founding of Sabine Pass and extend to its residents sincere best wishes for a meaningful and memorable event; and, be it further RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be prepared for the community of Sabine Pass as an expression of high regard by the Texas Senate and House of Representatives. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 64 was adopted by the Senate on April 22, 2009, by a viva-voce vote. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 64 was adopted by the House on May 24, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 148, Nays 0, one present not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House Approved: ______________________________ Date ______________________________ Governor