1 | 1 | | S.C.R. No. 64 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | SENATE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION |
---|
5 | 5 | | WHEREAS, Residents of Sabine Pass are gathering on May 3, |
---|
6 | 6 | | 2009, to celebrate the 170th anniversary of the founding of their |
---|
7 | 7 | | community; and |
---|
8 | 8 | | WHEREAS, First settled in the early 1830s, the town of Sabine |
---|
9 | 9 | | City was officially established on January 19, 1839, by a charter |
---|
10 | 10 | | signed by General Sam Houston; the Sabine City Company began to |
---|
11 | 11 | | advertise lots in the town on May 1, 1839, and in 1860, the city |
---|
12 | 12 | | changed its name to Sabine Pass; and |
---|
13 | 13 | | WHEREAS, In the 1800s, Sabine Pass was a major port on the |
---|
14 | 14 | | Gulf of Mexico, an important shipping point for cattle and cotton; |
---|
15 | 15 | | during the Civil War, the port was defended by Forts Sabine and |
---|
16 | 16 | | Griffin, and the town was the site of the Battle of Sabine Pass on |
---|
17 | 17 | | September 8, 1863, when Confederate gunners drove off an attack by |
---|
18 | 18 | | four Union gunboats; and |
---|
19 | 19 | | WHEREAS, Sabine Pass is the birthplace of Pattillo Higgins, |
---|
20 | 20 | | the entrepreneur who helped initiate the Spindletop oil strike in |
---|
21 | 21 | | the early 1900s; the town is also the birthplace of J. P. |
---|
22 | 22 | | Richardson, the rock 'n' roll star known as the Big Bopper; and |
---|
23 | 23 | | WHEREAS, Since 1978, the community has been part of Port |
---|
24 | 24 | | Arthur; its economy continues to depend on the oil industry, |
---|
25 | 25 | | commercial fishing, and marine repair; and |
---|
26 | 26 | | WHEREAS, Throughout the years, Sabine Pass has been hit hard |
---|
27 | 27 | | by hurricanes; an 1886 storm killed 86 people and almost destroyed |
---|
28 | 28 | | the town, and Hurricanes Rita, Humberto, Gustav, and Ike are |
---|
29 | 29 | | responsible for more recent damage; after each devastating event, |
---|
30 | 30 | | however, the people of Sabine Pass have come together to rebuild and |
---|
31 | 31 | | restore the vitality of their community; and |
---|
32 | 32 | | WHEREAS, The hardy spirit of Sabine Pass remains strong, and |
---|
33 | 33 | | its citizens may indeed take pride in their rich history as they |
---|
34 | 34 | | celebrate a notable milestone; now, therefore, be it |
---|
35 | 35 | | RESOLVED, That the 81st Legislature of the State of Texas |
---|
36 | 36 | | hereby commemorate the 170th anniversary of the founding of Sabine |
---|
37 | 37 | | Pass and extend to its residents sincere best wishes for a |
---|
38 | 38 | | meaningful and memorable event; and, be it further |
---|
39 | 39 | | RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be |
---|
40 | 40 | | prepared for the community of Sabine Pass as an expression of high |
---|
41 | 41 | | regard by the Texas Senate and House of Representatives. |
---|
42 | 42 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
43 | 43 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
44 | 44 | | I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 64 was adopted by the Senate |
---|
45 | 45 | | on April 22, 2009, by a viva-voce vote. |
---|
46 | 46 | | ______________________________ |
---|
47 | 47 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
48 | 48 | | I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 64 was adopted by the House |
---|
49 | 49 | | on May 24, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 148, Nays 0, one |
---|
50 | 50 | | present not voting. |
---|
51 | 51 | | ______________________________ |
---|
52 | 52 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
53 | 53 | | Approved: |
---|
54 | 54 | | ______________________________ |
---|
55 | 55 | | Date |
---|
56 | 56 | | ______________________________ |
---|
57 | 57 | | Governor |
---|