E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5158 | |
E | 06/03/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5156 | |
House | 06/03/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6968 | |
Senate | 06/02/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 5152 | |
Senate | 06/01/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 5155 | |
Senate | 06/01/2009 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 5137 | |
House | 06/01/2009 | Record vote | RV#1745 | Journal Page: 6963 |
House | 06/01/2009 | Adopted | SB 726 | Journal Page: 6963 |
House | 06/01/2009 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 6963 | |
House | 06/01/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 6972 | |
Senate | 06/01/2009 | Read | Journal Page: 5108 | |
Senate | 06/01/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 5108 | |
Senate | 05/31/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |