E
|
05/12/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
05/12/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3968
|
E
|
05/03/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2914
|
Senate
|
05/02/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1624
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2654
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2658
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2386
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1377
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1377
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1377
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1377
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1377
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1377
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1377
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1163
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
|
|
Journal Page: 897
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 897
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 843
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1228
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#163
|
Journal Page: 1132
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1132
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1132
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1125
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1125
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 942
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2011
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 569
|
House
|
03/01/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 569
|
House
|
02/16/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|