Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1409 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Flynn (Senate Sponsor - Deuell) H.B. No. 1409
 (In the Senate - Received from the House March 31, 2011;
 April 4, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation and Homeland Security; April 18, 2011, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; April 18, 2011,
 sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of a segment of State Highway 243 in Van
 Zandt County as the Veterans Memorial Parkway.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.082 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.082.  VETERANS MEMORIAL PARKWAY. (a) State
 Highway 243 in Van Zandt County, between State Highway 198 and State
 Highway 64, is designated as the Veterans Memorial Parkway.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct memorial markers indicating
 the highway number, the designation as the Veterans Memorial
 Parkway, and any other appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the parkway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the parkway.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *