House | 05/04/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2913 | |
House | 04/27/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Referred to Government Efficiency & Reform | Journal Page: 1501 | |
House | 04/05/2011 | Correction in referral | Journal Page: 1501 | |
House | 03/01/2011 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 570 | |
House | 03/01/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 570 | |
House | 02/16/2011 | Filed |