Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1423 Latest Draft

Bill / House Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            82R24242 CAE-D
 By: Garza, Callegari, Pena, Aliseda, Hughes, H.B. No. 1423
 et al.
 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 1423:
 By:  Zedler C.S.H.B. No. 1423


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to restrictions on written information required to be
 provided by public school teachers and a study by the commissioner
 of education concerning implementation of the restrictions.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 7.060, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  The commissioner shall conduct a study of how a school
 district can timely accomplish the results prescribed under Section
 11.164(d) concerning reduction in the written information a teacher
 is required to prepare. Not later than January 1, 2013, the
 commissioner shall submit the results of the study to the governor,
 the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of
 representatives, and the presiding officers of each legislative
 standing committee with primary jurisdiction over public education
 and make the results available to each school district in this
 state. This subsection expires January 31, 2013.
 SECTION 2.  Section 11.164, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  In addition to the requirements otherwise prescribed by
 this section, the board of trustees of each school district shall
 adopt policies that result in a substantial reduction of the total
 amount of written information that a teacher is required to
 prepare, as determined in comparison to the total amount of written
 information required to be prepared by a teacher during the
 2011-2012 school year. The board of trustees shall base the amount
 of the reduction required on the results of the study conducted
 under Section 7.060(c).  A school district shall implement the
 policies required by this subsection beginning not later than the
 2014-2015 school year. This subsection expires September 1, 2015.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.