House | 05/13/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3886 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Record vote | RV#1059 | Journal Page: 3885 |
House | 05/13/2011 | Failed to pass | Journal Page: 3885 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3885 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3732 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3732 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3732 | |
House | 05/09/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2796 | |
House | 04/29/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/29/2011 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 04/29/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/03/2011 | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services | Journal Page: 666 | |
House | 03/03/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 666 | |
House | 02/23/2011 | Filed |