1 | 1 | | 82R7591 SGA-F |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Rodriguez H.B. No. 1677 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
6 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 7 | | relating to the administration and funding of retirement systems |
---|
8 | 8 | | for firefighters in certain municipalities. |
---|
9 | 9 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
10 | 10 | | SECTION 1. Section 2.03(b), Chapter 183 (S.B. 598), Acts of |
---|
11 | 11 | | the 64th Legislature, Regular Session, 1975 (Article 6243e.1, |
---|
12 | 12 | | Vernon's Texas Civil Statutes), is amended to read as follows: |
---|
13 | 13 | | (b) Between November 1 of each year and the first Monday in |
---|
14 | 14 | | January of the following year, the board of trustees shall hold an |
---|
15 | 15 | | election to elect one member of the board of trustees. If only one |
---|
16 | 16 | | firefighter or retiree is nominated for a position under Subsection |
---|
17 | 17 | | (c) of this section, instead of holding an election, the board of |
---|
18 | 18 | | trustees may appoint the sole nominated candidate at the first |
---|
19 | 19 | | board meeting in January. The board shall adopt procedures for the |
---|
20 | 20 | | appointment of a sole nominated candidate under this subsection. A |
---|
21 | 21 | | board member appointed under this subsection is considered elected |
---|
22 | 22 | | for purposes of this Act. |
---|
23 | 23 | | SECTION 2. Sections 10.01(a) and (b), Chapter 183 (S.B. |
---|
24 | 24 | | 598), Acts of the 64th Legislature, Regular Session, 1975 (Article |
---|
25 | 25 | | 6243e.1, Vernon's Texas Civil Statutes), are amended to read as |
---|
26 | 26 | | follows: |
---|
27 | 27 | | (a) Each municipality in which a fire department to which |
---|
28 | 28 | | this Act applies is located shall appropriate and contribute to the |
---|
29 | 29 | | fund an amount equal to a percentage [18.05 percent] of the |
---|
30 | 30 | | compensation of all members during that month as follows: |
---|
31 | 31 | | (1) 19.05 percent, beginning on the first pay date |
---|
32 | 32 | | following September 30, 2010, through the pay date immediately |
---|
33 | 33 | | preceding September 30, 2011; |
---|
34 | 34 | | (2) 20.05 percent, beginning on the first pay date |
---|
35 | 35 | | following September 30, 2011, through the pay date immediately |
---|
36 | 36 | | preceding September 30, 2012; |
---|
37 | 37 | | (3) 21.05 percent, for 24 pay dates of the |
---|
38 | 38 | | municipality beginning on the first pay date following September |
---|
39 | 39 | | 30, 2012; and |
---|
40 | 40 | | (4) 22.05 percent, for all pay dates of the |
---|
41 | 41 | | municipality that follow the 24 pay dates referenced in Subdivision |
---|
42 | 42 | | (3) of this subsection. |
---|
43 | 43 | | (b) Each firefighter shall pay into the fund each month a |
---|
44 | 44 | | percentage [13.70 percent] of the firefighter's compensation for |
---|
45 | 45 | | that month as follows: |
---|
46 | 46 | | (1) 15.70 percent, for the pay dates of the |
---|
47 | 47 | | municipality following September 30, 2010, through the pay date |
---|
48 | 48 | | immediately preceding September 30, 2011; |
---|
49 | 49 | | (2) 16.20 percent, beginning on the first pay date of |
---|
50 | 50 | | the municipality following September 30, 2011, through the pay date |
---|
51 | 51 | | immediately preceding September 30, 2012; |
---|
52 | 52 | | (3) 16.70 percent, beginning on the first pay date of |
---|
53 | 53 | | the municipality following September 30, 2012, through the pay date |
---|
54 | 54 | | immediately preceding September 30, 2013; |
---|
55 | 55 | | (4) 17.20 percent, beginning on the first pay date of |
---|
56 | 56 | | the municipality following September 30, 2013, through the pay date |
---|
57 | 57 | | immediately preceding September 30, 2014; |
---|
58 | 58 | | (5) 17.70 percent, beginning on the first pay date of |
---|
59 | 59 | | the municipality following September 30, 2014, through the pay date |
---|
60 | 60 | | immediately preceding September 30, 2015; |
---|
61 | 61 | | (6) 18.20 percent, beginning on the first pay date of |
---|
62 | 62 | | the municipality following September 30, 2015, through the pay date |
---|
63 | 63 | | immediately preceding September 30, 2016; and |
---|
64 | 64 | | (7) 18.70 percent, for the first pay date of the |
---|
65 | 65 | | municipality following September 30, 2016, and all subsequent pay |
---|
66 | 66 | | dates of the municipality. |
---|
67 | 67 | | SECTION 3. The board of trustees of a retirement system |
---|
68 | 68 | | subject to this Act shall adopt procedures required under Section |
---|
69 | 69 | | 2.03(b), Chapter 183 (S.B. 598), Acts of the 64th Legislature, |
---|
70 | 70 | | Regular Session, 1975 (Article 6243e.1, Vernon's Texas Civil |
---|
71 | 71 | | Statutes), as amended by this Act, before a sole nominated |
---|
72 | 72 | | candidate may be appointed to the board of trustees. |
---|
73 | 73 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2011. |
---|