Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1677 Latest Draft

Bill / House Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            82R7591 SGA-F
 By: Rodriguez H.B. No. 1677


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the administration and funding of retirement systems
 for firefighters in certain municipalities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2.03(b), Chapter 183 (S.B. 598), Acts of
 the 64th Legislature, Regular Session, 1975 (Article 6243e.1,
 Vernon's Texas Civil Statutes), is amended to read as follows:
 (b)  Between November 1 of each year and the first Monday in
 January of the following year, the board of trustees shall hold an
 election to elect one member of the board of trustees. If only one
 firefighter or retiree is nominated for a position under Subsection
 (c) of this section, instead of holding an election, the board of
 trustees may appoint the sole nominated candidate at the first
 board meeting in January. The board shall adopt procedures for the
 appointment of a sole nominated candidate under this subsection.  A
 board member appointed under this subsection is considered elected
 for purposes of this Act.
 SECTION 2.  Sections 10.01(a) and (b), Chapter 183 (S.B.
 598), Acts of the 64th Legislature, Regular Session, 1975 (Article
 6243e.1, Vernon's Texas Civil Statutes), are amended to read as
 follows:
 (a)  Each municipality in which a fire department to which
 this Act applies is located shall appropriate and contribute to the
 fund an amount equal to a percentage [18.05 percent] of the
 compensation of all members during that month as follows:
 (1)  19.05 percent, beginning on the first pay date
 following September 30, 2010, through the pay date immediately
 preceding September 30, 2011;
 (2)  20.05 percent, beginning on the first pay date
 following September 30, 2011, through the pay date immediately
 preceding September 30, 2012;
 (3)  21.05 percent, for 24 pay dates of the
 municipality beginning on the first pay date following September
 30, 2012; and
 (4)  22.05 percent, for all pay dates of the
 municipality that follow the 24 pay dates referenced in Subdivision
 (3) of this subsection.
 (b)  Each firefighter shall pay into the fund each month a
 percentage [13.70 percent] of the firefighter's compensation for
 that month as follows:
 (1)  15.70 percent, for the pay dates of the
 municipality following September 30, 2010, through the pay date
 immediately preceding September 30, 2011;
 (2)  16.20 percent, beginning on the first pay date of
 the municipality following September 30, 2011, through the pay date
 immediately preceding September 30, 2012;
 (3)  16.70 percent, beginning on the first pay date of
 the municipality following September 30, 2012, through the pay date
 immediately preceding September 30, 2013;
 (4)  17.20 percent, beginning on the first pay date of
 the municipality following September 30, 2013, through the pay date
 immediately preceding September 30, 2014;
 (5)  17.70 percent, beginning on the first pay date of
 the municipality following September 30, 2014, through the pay date
 immediately preceding September 30, 2015;
 (6)  18.20 percent, beginning on the first pay date of
 the municipality following September 30, 2015, through the pay date
 immediately preceding September 30, 2016; and
 (7)  18.70 percent, for the first pay date of the
 municipality following September 30, 2016, and all subsequent pay
 dates of the municipality.
 SECTION 3.  The board of trustees of a retirement system
 subject to this Act shall adopt procedures required under Section
 2.03(b), Chapter 183 (S.B. 598), Acts of the 64th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 1975 (Article 6243e.1, Vernon's Texas Civil
 Statutes), as amended by this Act, before a sole nominated
 candidate may be appointed to the board of trustees.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.