E | 05/28/2011 | Effective on 9/1/11 | ||
E | 05/28/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6874 | |
E | 05/18/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4338 | |
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2469 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3860 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3968 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3827 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 2232 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2232 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2232 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2232 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2232 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2232 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2232 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/03/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/03/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/03/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1708 | |
Senate | 05/03/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/03/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/20/2011 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 1278 | |
Senate | 04/20/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1278 | |
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1141 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1866 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1806 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Record vote | RV#379 | Journal Page: 1805 |
House | 04/14/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1805 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1805 | |
House | 04/13/2011 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1756 | |
House | 04/13/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1756 | |
House | 04/13/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1115 | |
House | 03/22/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/22/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/22/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/07/2011 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 694 | |
House | 03/07/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 694 | |
House | 03/01/2011 | Filed |