Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1953 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Kuempel (Senate Sponsor - Eltife) H.B. No. 1953
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 18, 2011;
 April 20, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business and Commerce; May 3, 2011, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 3, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to notice by sign of an alcoholic beverage permit or
 license application.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 11.391(a), Alcoholic Beverage Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  An applicant for a permit issued under this code for a
 location not previously licensed for the on-premises consumption of
 alcoholic beverages must [shall], not later than the 60th day
 before the date the permit [application] is issued [filed],
 prominently post an outdoor sign at the location stating that
 alcoholic beverages are intended to be served on the premises, the
 type of permit, and the name and business address of the applicant.
 SECTION 2.  Section 61.381(a), Alcoholic Beverage Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  An applicant for a license issued under this code for a
 location not previously licensed for the on-premises consumption of
 alcoholic beverages must [shall], not later than the 60th day
 before the date the license [application] is issued [filed],
 prominently post an outdoor sign at the location stating that
 alcoholic beverages are intended to be served on the premises, the
 type of license, and the name and business address of the applicant.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an application for an alcoholic beverage permit or license filed
 on or after the effective date of this Act. An application filed
 before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in
 effect immediately before the effective date of this Act, and that
 law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *