Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2632 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Driver (Senate Sponsor - Wentworth) H.B. No. 2632
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2011;
 April 29, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Government Organization; May 18, 2011, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 18, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to access to the criminal history record information of
 certain persons by the Texas Facilities Commission.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter F, Chapter 411, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 411.1391 to read as follows:
 Sec. 411.1391.  ACCESS TO CRIMINAL HISTORY RECORD
 INFORMATION: TEXAS FACILITIES COMMISSION. (a) The Texas Facilities
 Commission is entitled to obtain from the department criminal
 history record information maintained by the department that
 relates to a person who:
 (1)  is an employee or an applicant for employment with
 the commission;
 (2)  is a consultant, intern, or volunteer for the
 commission or an applicant to serve as a consultant, intern, or
 volunteer;
 (3)  proposes to enter into a contract with or has a
 contract with the commission to perform services for or supply
 goods to the commission; or
 (4)  is an employee or subcontractor, or an applicant
 to be an employee or subcontractor, of a contractor that provides
 services to the commission.
 (b)  Criminal history record information obtained by the
 Texas Facilities Commission under Subsection (a) may not be
 released or disclosed to any person except:
 (1)  on court order; or
 (2)  with the consent of the person who is the subject
 of the criminal history record information.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *