Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2651 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Allen, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Ellis) H.B. No. 2651
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2011;
 May 9, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation and Homeland Security; May 21, 2011, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 21, 2011, sent
 to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the eligibility of visitors to use certain public
 transportation services for people with disabilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 461, Transportation Code, is amended by
 adding Section 461.009 to read as follows:
 Sec. 461.009.  ELIGIBILITY OF VISITORS TO USE CERTAIN PUBLIC
 TRANSPORTATION SERVICES FOR PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES. (a)  In this
 section:
 (1)  "Provider" means a public transportation provider
 that provides public transportation services designed for people
 with disabilities who are unable to use the provider's bus or rail
 services.
 (2)  "Services" means public transportation services
 provided by a public transportation provider and designed for
 people with disabilities who are unable to use the provider's bus or
 rail services.
 (b)  A provider shall determine if an individual who resides
 outside of the provider's service area and who seeks to use the
 provider's services while visiting the provider's service area is
 eligible to use the services not later than two business days after
 the date the individual gives the provider the appropriate notice
 and submits any required documentation.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *