E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6917
|
E
|
05/24/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5764
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3112
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5036
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5399
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4613
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2628
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2628
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2628
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2628
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2627
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2627
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2627
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2611
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 1082
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1082
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 840
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1374
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#163
|
Journal Page: 1131
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1131
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1131
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1122
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Otto
|
Journal Page: 1122
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1122
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 922
|
House
|
03/14/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2011
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 385
|
House
|
02/16/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 385
|
House
|
12/01/2010
|
Filed
|
|
|