Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB361 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Otto (Senate Sponsor - Seliger) H.B. No. 361
 (In the Senate - Received from the House March 31, 2011;
 April 13, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 19, 2011, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 19, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the agricultural advisory board of an appraisal
 district.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 6.12(b) and (d), Tax Code, are amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  The [One of the] agricultural advisory board [members
 must be a representative of the county agricultural stabilization
 and conservation service, and the remainder of the] members must be
 landowners of the district whose land qualifies for appraisal under
 Subchapter C, D, E, or H, Chapter 23, and who have been residents of
 the district for at least five years.
 (d)  The board shall meet at the call of the chief appraiser
 at least once [three times] a year.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act in the
 qualifications of members of an agricultural advisory board does
 not affect the entitlement of a member serving on the board
 immediately before the effective date of this Act to continue to
 carry out the board's functions for the remainder of the member's
 term.  The change in law applies only to a member appointed on or
 after the effective date of this Act.  This Act does not prohibit a
 person who is a member of the board on the effective date of this Act
 from being reappointed to the board if the person has the
 qualifications required for a member under Section 6.12, Tax Code,
 as amended by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *