Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2509
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1338
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1338
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1094
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1866
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1741
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#360
|
Journal Page: 1740
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1740
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1740
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1681
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#340
|
Journal Page: 1680
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1680
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Amended
|
2-C. Howard
|
Journal Page: 1680
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1679
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Postponed
|
4/12/11 10:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 1653
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1653
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1227
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2011
|
Referred to Land & Resource Management
|
|
Journal Page: 385
|
House
|
02/16/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 385
|
House
|
12/02/2010
|
Filed
|
|
|