Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB365 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Turner, Bohac (Senate Sponsor - Ellis) H.B. No. 365
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 14, 2011;
 April 26, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 17, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 17, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of eminent domain authority by certain
 municipalities to take abandoned multi-family rental buildings.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2206.001, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (b-1) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  Subsection (b)(3) does not prohibit the taking of
 private property through the use of eminent domain for economic
 development purposes if the economic development is a secondary
 purpose resulting from the elimination of urban blight under
 Subchapter J, Chapter 214, Local Government Code.  This subsection
 expires December 31, 2016.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 214, Local Government Code, is amended
 by adding Subchapter J to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER J. EMINENT DOMAIN AUTHORITY OF CERTAIN MUNICIPALITIES TO
 TAKE ABANDONED MULTI-FAMILY RENTAL BUILDINGS
 Sec. 214.401.  APPLICABILITY OF SUBCHAPTER. This subchapter
 applies only to a municipality with a population of more than 1.9
 million.
 Sec. 214.402.  DEFINITION. In this subchapter,
 "multi-family rental building" has the meaning assigned by Section
 214.219.
 Sec. 214.403.  EMINENT DOMAIN AUTHORITY. A municipality may
 take a multi-family rental building through the use of eminent
 domain for the purpose of the elimination of urban blight if a tract
 or unit of real property on which the multi-family rental building
 sits presents the following conditions for at least one year after
 the date on which notice of the conditions is reasonably attempted
 to be provided to the property owner:
 (1)  all lawful occupation of or construction activity
 for the building has ceased;
 (2)  the property contains uninhabitable, unsafe, and
 unsanitary units that are not fit for their intended use because the
 utilities, sewerage, plumbing, or heating or a similar service or
 facility of the units has been destroyed, removed, or rendered
 ineffective; and
 (3)  the property has been the location of
 substantiated and repeated illegal activity of which the property
 owner knew or should have known.
 Sec. 214.404.  EXPIRATION OF SUBCHAPTER.  This subchapter
 expires December 31, 2016.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a condemnation proceeding in which the condemnation petition is
 filed on or after the effective date of this Act and to any property
 condemned through the proceeding. A condemnation proceeding in
 which the condemnation petition is filed before the effective date
 of this Act and any property condemned through the proceeding are
 governed by the law in effect immediately before the effective date
 of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *