1 | 1 | | By: Turner, Bohac (Senate Sponsor - Ellis) H.B. No. 365 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 14, 2011; |
---|
3 | 3 | | April 26, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on State |
---|
4 | 4 | | Affairs; May 17, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote: |
---|
5 | 5 | | Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 17, 2011, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
9 | 9 | | AN ACT |
---|
10 | 10 | | relating to the use of eminent domain authority by certain |
---|
11 | 11 | | municipalities to take abandoned multi-family rental buildings. |
---|
12 | 12 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
13 | 13 | | SECTION 1. Section 2206.001, Government Code, is amended by |
---|
14 | 14 | | adding Subsection (b-1) to read as follows: |
---|
15 | 15 | | (b-1) Subsection (b)(3) does not prohibit the taking of |
---|
16 | 16 | | private property through the use of eminent domain for economic |
---|
17 | 17 | | development purposes if the economic development is a secondary |
---|
18 | 18 | | purpose resulting from the elimination of urban blight under |
---|
19 | 19 | | Subchapter J, Chapter 214, Local Government Code. This subsection |
---|
20 | 20 | | expires December 31, 2016. |
---|
21 | 21 | | SECTION 2. Chapter 214, Local Government Code, is amended |
---|
22 | 22 | | by adding Subchapter J to read as follows: |
---|
23 | 23 | | SUBCHAPTER J. EMINENT DOMAIN AUTHORITY OF CERTAIN MUNICIPALITIES TO |
---|
24 | 24 | | TAKE ABANDONED MULTI-FAMILY RENTAL BUILDINGS |
---|
25 | 25 | | Sec. 214.401. APPLICABILITY OF SUBCHAPTER. This subchapter |
---|
26 | 26 | | applies only to a municipality with a population of more than 1.9 |
---|
27 | 27 | | million. |
---|
28 | 28 | | Sec. 214.402. DEFINITION. In this subchapter, |
---|
29 | 29 | | "multi-family rental building" has the meaning assigned by Section |
---|
30 | 30 | | 214.219. |
---|
31 | 31 | | Sec. 214.403. EMINENT DOMAIN AUTHORITY. A municipality may |
---|
32 | 32 | | take a multi-family rental building through the use of eminent |
---|
33 | 33 | | domain for the purpose of the elimination of urban blight if a tract |
---|
34 | 34 | | or unit of real property on which the multi-family rental building |
---|
35 | 35 | | sits presents the following conditions for at least one year after |
---|
36 | 36 | | the date on which notice of the conditions is reasonably attempted |
---|
37 | 37 | | to be provided to the property owner: |
---|
38 | 38 | | (1) all lawful occupation of or construction activity |
---|
39 | 39 | | for the building has ceased; |
---|
40 | 40 | | (2) the property contains uninhabitable, unsafe, and |
---|
41 | 41 | | unsanitary units that are not fit for their intended use because the |
---|
42 | 42 | | utilities, sewerage, plumbing, or heating or a similar service or |
---|
43 | 43 | | facility of the units has been destroyed, removed, or rendered |
---|
44 | 44 | | ineffective; and |
---|
45 | 45 | | (3) the property has been the location of |
---|
46 | 46 | | substantiated and repeated illegal activity of which the property |
---|
47 | 47 | | owner knew or should have known. |
---|
48 | 48 | | Sec. 214.404. EXPIRATION OF SUBCHAPTER. This subchapter |
---|
49 | 49 | | expires December 31, 2016. |
---|
50 | 50 | | SECTION 3. The change in law made by this Act applies only |
---|
51 | 51 | | to a condemnation proceeding in which the condemnation petition is |
---|
52 | 52 | | filed on or after the effective date of this Act and to any property |
---|
53 | 53 | | condemned through the proceeding. A condemnation proceeding in |
---|
54 | 54 | | which the condemnation petition is filed before the effective date |
---|
55 | 55 | | of this Act and any property condemned through the proceeding are |
---|
56 | 56 | | governed by the law in effect immediately before the effective date |
---|
57 | 57 | | of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for that purpose. |
---|
58 | 58 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2011. |
---|
59 | 59 | | * * * * * |
---|