E
|
05/21/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
05/21/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5048
|
E
|
05/11/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3830
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2214
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3538
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3830
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3521
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2152
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2152
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2152
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2152
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2152
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2152
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2152
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1708
|
Senate
|
05/02/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1602
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1373
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1373
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1295
|
House
|
04/25/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2264
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2148
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#503
|
Journal Page: 2148
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2148
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2148
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2117
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2117
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1835
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2011
|
Referred to Insurance
|
|
Journal Page: 391
|
House
|
02/16/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 391
|
House
|
12/15/2010
|
Filed
|
|
|