1 | 1 | | By: Thompson, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Carona) H.B. No. 438 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2011; |
---|
3 | 3 | | April 27, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on State |
---|
4 | 4 | | Affairs; May 3, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote: |
---|
5 | 5 | | Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 3, 2011, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
9 | 9 | | AN ACT |
---|
10 | 10 | | relating to health benefit plan coverage for orally administered |
---|
11 | 11 | | anticancer medications. |
---|
12 | 12 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
13 | 13 | | SECTION 1. Chapter 1369, Insurance Code, is amended by |
---|
14 | 14 | | adding Subchapter E to read as follows: |
---|
15 | 15 | | SUBCHAPTER E. COVERAGE FOR ORALLY ADMINISTERED ANTICANCER |
---|
16 | 16 | | MEDICATIONS |
---|
17 | 17 | | Sec. 1369.201. DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter: |
---|
18 | 18 | | (1) "Health benefit exchange" means an American Health |
---|
19 | 19 | | Benefit Exchange administered by the federal government or created |
---|
20 | 20 | | pursuant to Section 1311(b), Patient Protection and Affordable Care |
---|
21 | 21 | | Act (42 U.S.C. Section 18031). |
---|
22 | 22 | | (2) "Qualified health plan" has the meaning assigned |
---|
23 | 23 | | by Section 1301(a), Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act (42 |
---|
24 | 24 | | U.S.C. Section 18021). |
---|
25 | 25 | | Sec. 1369.202. APPLICABILITY OF SUBCHAPTER. This |
---|
26 | 26 | | subchapter applies only to a health benefit plan, including a small |
---|
27 | 27 | | employer health benefit plan written under Chapter 1501 or coverage |
---|
28 | 28 | | provided by a health group cooperative under Subchapter B of that |
---|
29 | 29 | | chapter, that provides benefits for medical or surgical expenses |
---|
30 | 30 | | incurred as a result of a health condition, accident, or sickness, |
---|
31 | 31 | | including an individual, group, blanket, or franchise insurance |
---|
32 | 32 | | policy or insurance agreement, a group hospital service contract, |
---|
33 | 33 | | or an individual or group evidence of coverage or similar coverage |
---|
34 | 34 | | document that is offered by: |
---|
35 | 35 | | (1) an insurance company; |
---|
36 | 36 | | (2) a group hospital service corporation operating |
---|
37 | 37 | | under Chapter 842; |
---|
38 | 38 | | (3) a fraternal benefit society operating under |
---|
39 | 39 | | Chapter 885; |
---|
40 | 40 | | (4) a stipulated premium company operating under |
---|
41 | 41 | | Chapter 884; |
---|
42 | 42 | | (5) an exchange operating under Chapter 942; |
---|
43 | 43 | | (6) a Lloyd's plan operating under Chapter 941; |
---|
44 | 44 | | (7) a health maintenance organization operating under |
---|
45 | 45 | | Chapter 843; or |
---|
46 | 46 | | (8) an approved nonprofit health corporation that |
---|
47 | 47 | | holds a certificate of authority under Chapter 844. |
---|
48 | 48 | | Sec. 1369.203. EXCEPTION. (a) This subchapter does not |
---|
49 | 49 | | apply to: |
---|
50 | 50 | | (1) a plan that provides coverage: |
---|
51 | 51 | | (A) only for fixed indemnity benefits for a |
---|
52 | 52 | | specified disease or diseases; |
---|
53 | 53 | | (B) only for accidental death or dismemberment; |
---|
54 | 54 | | (C) for wages or payments in lieu of wages for a |
---|
55 | 55 | | period during which an employee is absent from work because of |
---|
56 | 56 | | sickness or injury; |
---|
57 | 57 | | (D) as a supplement to a liability insurance |
---|
58 | 58 | | policy; |
---|
59 | 59 | | (E) only for dental or vision care; or |
---|
60 | 60 | | (F) only for indemnity for hospital confinement; |
---|
61 | 61 | | (2) a Medicare supplemental policy as defined by |
---|
62 | 62 | | Section 1882(g)(1), Social Security Act (42 U.S.C. Section 1395ss); |
---|
63 | 63 | | (3) a workers' compensation insurance policy; |
---|
64 | 64 | | (4) medical payment insurance coverage provided under |
---|
65 | 65 | | an automobile insurance policy; |
---|
66 | 66 | | (5) a credit insurance policy; |
---|
67 | 67 | | (6) a limited benefit policy that does not provide |
---|
68 | 68 | | coverage for physical examinations or wellness exams; |
---|
69 | 69 | | (7) a multiple employer welfare arrangement that holds |
---|
70 | 70 | | a certificate of authority under Chapter 846; or |
---|
71 | 71 | | (8) a long-term care insurance policy, including a |
---|
72 | 72 | | nursing home fixed indemnity policy, unless the commissioner |
---|
73 | 73 | | determines that the policy provides benefit coverage so |
---|
74 | 74 | | comprehensive that the policy is a health benefit plan as described |
---|
75 | 75 | | by Section 1369.201. |
---|
76 | 76 | | (b) This subchapter does not apply to a qualified health |
---|
77 | 77 | | plan offered through a health benefit exchange. |
---|
78 | 78 | | Sec. 1369.204. REQUIRED COVERAGE FOR ORALLY ADMINISTERED |
---|
79 | 79 | | ANTICANCER MEDICATIONS. (a) A health benefit plan that provides |
---|
80 | 80 | | coverage for cancer treatment must provide coverage for a |
---|
81 | 81 | | prescribed, orally administered anticancer medication that is used |
---|
82 | 82 | | to kill or slow the growth of cancerous cells on a basis no less |
---|
83 | 83 | | favorable than intravenously administered or injected cancer |
---|
84 | 84 | | medications that are covered as medical benefits by the plan. |
---|
85 | 85 | | (b) This section does not prohibit a health benefit plan |
---|
86 | 86 | | from requiring prior authorization for an orally administered |
---|
87 | 87 | | anticancer medication. If an orally administered anticancer |
---|
88 | 88 | | medication is authorized, the cost to the covered individual may |
---|
89 | 89 | | not exceed the coinsurance or copayment that would be applied to a |
---|
90 | 90 | | chemotherapy or other cancer treatment visit. |
---|
91 | 91 | | (c) A health benefit plan issuer may not reclassify |
---|
92 | 92 | | anticancer medications or increase a coinsurance, copayment, |
---|
93 | 93 | | deductible, or other out-of-pocket expense imposed on anticancer |
---|
94 | 94 | | medications to achieve compliance with this section. Any plan |
---|
95 | 95 | | change that otherwise increases an out-of-pocket expense applied to |
---|
96 | 96 | | anticancer medications must also be applied to the majority of |
---|
97 | 97 | | comparable medical or pharmaceutical benefits under the plan. |
---|
98 | 98 | | (d) This section does not prohibit a health benefit plan |
---|
99 | 99 | | issuer from increasing cost-sharing for all benefits, including |
---|
100 | 100 | | anticancer treatments. |
---|
101 | 101 | | SECTION 2. Subchapter E, Chapter 1369, Insurance Code, as |
---|
102 | 102 | | added by this Act, applies only to a health benefit plan that is |
---|
103 | 103 | | delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed on or after January 1, |
---|
104 | 104 | | 2012. A health benefit plan that is delivered, issued for delivery, |
---|
105 | 105 | | or renewed before January 1, 2012, is covered by the law in effect |
---|
106 | 106 | | at the time the plan was delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed, |
---|
107 | 107 | | and that law is continued in effect for that purpose. |
---|
108 | 108 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2011. |
---|
109 | 109 | | * * * * * |
---|