Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB438 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Thompson, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Carona) H.B. No. 438
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2011;
 April 27, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 3, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 3, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to health benefit plan coverage for orally administered
 anticancer medications.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 1369, Insurance Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter E to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER E. COVERAGE FOR ORALLY ADMINISTERED ANTICANCER
 MEDICATIONS
 Sec. 1369.201.  DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter:
 (1)  "Health benefit exchange" means an American Health
 Benefit Exchange administered by the federal government or created
 pursuant to Section 1311(b), Patient Protection and Affordable Care
 Act (42 U.S.C. Section 18031).
 (2)  "Qualified health plan" has the meaning assigned
 by Section 1301(a), Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act (42
 U.S.C. Section 18021).
 Sec. 1369.202.  APPLICABILITY OF SUBCHAPTER. This
 subchapter applies only to a health benefit plan, including a small
 employer health benefit plan written under Chapter 1501 or coverage
 provided by a health group cooperative under Subchapter B of that
 chapter, that provides benefits for medical or surgical expenses
 incurred as a result of a health condition, accident, or sickness,
 including an individual, group, blanket, or franchise insurance
 policy or insurance agreement, a group hospital service contract,
 or an individual or group evidence of coverage or similar coverage
 document that is offered by:
 (1)  an insurance company;
 (2)  a group hospital service corporation operating
 under Chapter 842;
 (3)  a fraternal benefit society operating under
 Chapter 885;
 (4)  a stipulated premium company operating under
 Chapter 884;
 (5)  an exchange operating under Chapter 942;
 (6)  a Lloyd's plan operating under Chapter 941;
 (7)  a health maintenance organization operating under
 Chapter 843; or
 (8)  an approved nonprofit health corporation that
 holds a certificate of authority under Chapter 844.
 Sec. 1369.203.  EXCEPTION.  (a)  This subchapter does not
 apply to:
 (1)  a plan that provides coverage:
 (A)  only for fixed indemnity benefits for a
 specified disease or diseases;
 (B)  only for accidental death or dismemberment;
 (C)  for wages or payments in lieu of wages for a
 period during which an employee is absent from work because of
 sickness or injury;
 (D)  as a supplement to a liability insurance
 policy;
 (E)  only for dental or vision care; or
 (F)  only for indemnity for hospital confinement;
 (2)  a Medicare supplemental policy as defined by
 Section 1882(g)(1), Social Security Act (42 U.S.C. Section 1395ss);
 (3)  a workers' compensation insurance policy;
 (4)  medical payment insurance coverage provided under
 an automobile insurance policy;
 (5)  a credit insurance policy;
 (6)  a limited benefit policy that does not provide
 coverage for physical examinations or wellness exams;
 (7)  a multiple employer welfare arrangement that holds
 a certificate of authority under Chapter 846; or
 (8)  a long-term care insurance policy, including a
 nursing home fixed indemnity policy, unless the commissioner
 determines that the policy provides benefit coverage so
 comprehensive that the policy is a health benefit plan as described
 by Section 1369.201.
 (b)  This subchapter does not apply to a qualified health
 plan offered through a health benefit exchange.
 Sec. 1369.204.  REQUIRED COVERAGE FOR ORALLY ADMINISTERED
 ANTICANCER MEDICATIONS. (a)  A health benefit plan that provides
 coverage for cancer treatment must provide coverage for a
 prescribed, orally administered anticancer medication that is used
 to kill or slow the growth of cancerous cells on a basis no less
 favorable than intravenously administered or injected cancer
 medications that are covered as medical benefits by the plan.
 (b)  This section does not prohibit a health benefit plan
 from requiring prior authorization for an orally administered
 anticancer medication.  If an orally administered anticancer
 medication is authorized, the cost to the covered individual may
 not exceed the coinsurance or copayment that would be applied to a
 chemotherapy or other cancer treatment visit.
 (c)  A health benefit plan issuer may not reclassify
 anticancer medications or increase a coinsurance, copayment,
 deductible, or other out-of-pocket expense imposed on anticancer
 medications to achieve compliance with this section. Any plan
 change that otherwise increases an out-of-pocket expense applied to
 anticancer medications must also be applied to the majority of
 comparable medical or pharmaceutical benefits under the plan.
 (d)  This section does not prohibit a health benefit plan
 issuer from increasing cost-sharing for all benefits, including
 anticancer treatments.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter E, Chapter 1369, Insurance Code, as
 added by this Act, applies only to a health benefit plan that is
 delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed on or after January 1,
 2012. A health benefit plan that is delivered, issued for delivery,
 or renewed before January 1, 2012, is covered by the law in effect
 at the time the plan was delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed,
 and that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *