E | 06/17/2011 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/17/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6917 | |
E | 05/20/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4766 | |
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2609 | |
House | 05/18/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4181 | |
House | 05/18/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4338 | |
House | 05/17/2011 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4119 | |
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 2379 | |
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2379 | |
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2379 | |
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2379 | |
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2379 | |
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2379 | |
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2379 | |
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/04/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/04/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1760 | |
Senate | 05/04/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/02/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/02/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/02/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/20/2011 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 1276 | |
Senate | 04/20/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1276 | |
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1050 | |
House | 04/12/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1768 | |
House | 04/12/2011 | Record vote | RV#335 | Journal Page: 1674 |
House | 04/12/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1674 | |
House | 04/12/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1674 | |
House | 04/11/2011 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1653 | |
House | 04/11/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1653 | |
House | 04/11/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/21/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/15/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/15/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 831 | |
House | 03/09/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/09/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/02/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/02/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/02/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/22/2011 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 457 | |
House | 02/22/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 457 | |
House | 01/19/2011 | Filed |