Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB726 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Sheffield (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) H.B. No. 726
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 13, 2011;
 April 20, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; May 4, 2011, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 4, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the electronic distribution of information to
 legislators by state agencies.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 2052.002(a) and (c), Government Code,
 are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  To avoid waste in the duplication and distribution of
 state agency publications, a state agency that issues a publication
 relating to the work of the agency and distributes the publication
 to members of the legislature shall send to each member before
 distributing the publication an electronic [a written] notice to
 determine whether the member wants to receive the publication.
 (c)  A member who elects to receive the publication shall
 notify the state agency.  The member may notify the agency
 electronically.
 SECTION 2.  Section 2052.0021(d), Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (d)  At the time a report required by law is ready for
 distribution outside the state agency, the agency shall send
 written notice to each member of the legislature that the report is
 available. The agency shall send the notice [by mail or, if it is
 acceptable to the member,] electronically. The notice must briefly
 describe the subject matter of the report and state:
 (1)  the manner in which the member may obtain the
 report electronically; and
 (2)  that the agency will send a printed copy of the
 report to the member at the request of the member.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *