E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6917
|
E
|
05/25/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5964
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3430
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5382
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5399
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4761
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2746
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2746
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2746
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2745
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2745
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2745
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2745
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2611
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 1600
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1600
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1294
|
House
|
04/25/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2264
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#503
|
Journal Page: 2149
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2149
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2149
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2141
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2141
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1642
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2011
|
Referred to Land & Resource Management
|
|
Journal Page: 319
|
House
|
02/09/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 319
|
House
|
11/08/2010
|
Filed
|
|
|