Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB91 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Cook (Senate Sponsor - Birdwell) H.B. No. 91
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2011;
 April 29, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 19, 2011, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 19, 2011, sent to
 printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the extent of extraterritorial jurisdiction for certain
 municipalities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 42.021, Local Government Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  Regardless of Subsection (a), the extraterritorial
 jurisdiction of a municipality is the unincorporated area that is
 contiguous to the corporate boundaries of the municipality and that
 is located within three miles of those boundaries if the
 municipality:
 (1)  has a population of not less than 20,000 or more
 than 29,000; and
 (2)  is located in a county that has a population of
 45,000 or more and borders the Trinity River.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *