House | 05/12/2011 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3730 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 356 | Journal Page: 3730 |
House | 05/09/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/19/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Transferred to Calendars Committee | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/08/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/08/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1662 | |
House | 03/31/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/31/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/31/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/17/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/17/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/17/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/17/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/28/2011 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 524 | |
House | 02/28/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 524 | |
House | 01/27/2011 | Filed |