Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB973 Latest Draft

Bill / House Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            82R16811 VOO-F
 By: Kleinschmidt H.B. No. 973
 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 973:
 By:  Berman C.S.H.B. No. 973


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to awards for certain members of the state military forces
 who were inducted into or served in federal military service in
 support of Operations Iraqi Freedom, New Dawn, and Enduring
 Freedom.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 431.134(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  The adjutant general may adopt rules and regulations
 relating to the:
 (1)  Texas Faithful Service Medal, which shall be
 awarded to a member of the state military forces who has completed
 five years of honorable service during which the person has shown
 fidelity to duty, efficient service, and great loyalty to the
 state;
 (2)  Federal Service Medal, which shall be awarded to a
 person who was inducted into federal service from the state
 military forces between June 15, 1940, and January 1, 1946, or after
 June 1, 1950, if the service was for more than 90 days;
 (3)  Texas Medal of Merit, which may be presented to a
 member of the military forces of this state, another state, or the
 United States who performs outstanding service or attains
 extraordinary achievement in behalf of the state or United States;
 (4)  Texas Outstanding Service Medal, which may be
 presented to a member of the military forces of this state, another
 state, or the United States who has performed service in a superior
 and clearly outstanding manner;
 (5)  Texas State Guard Service Medal, which shall be
 awarded to a person who completes three consecutive years of
 honorable service in the Texas State Guard during which the person
 has shown fidelity to duty, efficient service, and great loyalty to
 the state;
 (6)  Texas Desert Shield/Desert Storm Campaign Medal,
 which shall be awarded to a person who was inducted into federal
 service from the Texas National Guard after August 1, 1990, in
 support of Operation Desert Shield or Operation Desert Storm,
 without regard to the place that the person was deployed while
 serving on active federal military duty;
 (7)  Texas Humanitarian Service Medal, which shall be
 awarded to a person who:
 (A)  does not meet the criteria for an award of the
 federal Humanitarian Service Medal;
 (B)  is a member of the state military forces; and
 (C)  while serving on state active duty or active
 duty under state authority in accordance with Title 32 of the United
 States Code, participates satisfactorily in defense support to a
 mission under civilian authority to protect life or property during
 or soon after a natural disaster or civil unrest in the state;
 (8)  Texas Cavalry Medal, which shall be awarded to a
 person who:
 (A)  served on or after September 11, 2001, in the
 124th Cavalry, Texas Army National Guard; and
 (B)  served in a hostile fire zone as designated
 by the United States secretary of defense;
 (9)  Texas Combat Service Ribbon, which shall be
 awarded to a member of the Texas National Guard who served, after
 September 11, 2001, in a hostile fire zone as designated by the
 United States secretary of defense;
 (10)  Texas Purple Heart Medal, which shall be awarded
 to a person who, after September 11, 2001:
 (A)  was inducted into federal service from the
 Texas National Guard; and
 (B)  meets the criteria for an award of the
 federal Purple Heart Medal;
 (11)  Texas Superior Service Medal, which shall be
 awarded to:
 (A)  a member of the state military forces who
 has:
 (i)  completed 30 or more years of honorable
 state service or a combination of state and federal service; and
 (ii)  continually demonstrated superior
 performance and service while assigned to key leadership positions
 demanding responsibility; or
 (B)  a civilian who has contributed significant
 service to the state military forces; [and]
 (12)  Texas Homeland Defense Service Medal, which shall
 be awarded to a member of the state military forces who served:
 (A)  on or after September 11, 2001;
 (B)  on state active duty or active duty under
 state authority in accordance with Title 32 of the United States
 Code; and
 (C)  satisfactorily in defense support to a
 mission in the state under civilian authority;
 (13)  Texas Iraqi Campaign Medal, which shall be
 awarded to a person who was inducted into federal military service
 from the Texas National Guard or to a member of the Texas National
 Guard who served in federal military service, without regard to the
 place that the person was deployed while serving on active federal
 military duty, after:
 (A)  March 19, 2003, in support of Operation Iraqi
 Freedom; or
 (B)  August 31, 2010, in support of Operation New
 Dawn; and
 (14)  Texas Afghanistan Campaign Medal, which shall be
 awarded to a person who was inducted into federal military service
 from the Texas National Guard or to a member of the Texas National
 Guard who served in federal military service after October 6, 2001,
 in support of Operation Enduring Freedom, without regard to the
 place that the person was deployed while serving on active federal
 military duty.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.