E | 06/17/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6919 | |
E | 05/20/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4766 | |
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2609 | |
House | 05/18/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4181 | |
House | 05/18/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4338 | |
House | 05/17/2011 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4122 | |
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2383 | |
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2383 | |
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2383 | |
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2383 | |
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2195 | |
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 1340 | |
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1340 | |
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1168 | |
House | 04/18/2011 | Record vote | RV#420 | Journal Page: 1904 |
House | 04/18/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1904 | |
House | 04/18/2011 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 1904 | |
House | 04/18/2011 | Placed on Resolutions Calendar | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/08/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/07/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/07/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1642 | |
House | 04/06/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/01/2011 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 573 | |
House | 02/22/2011 | Filed |