1 | 1 | | By: Hopson, Hughes (Senate Sponsor - Eltife) H.C.R. No. 69 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 19, 2011; |
---|
3 | 3 | | April 26, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
4 | 4 | | Administration; May 10, 2011, reported favorably by the following |
---|
5 | 5 | | vote: Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 10, 2011, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION |
---|
9 | 9 | | WHEREAS, The late Dr. Bob Glaze demonstrated a deep |
---|
10 | 10 | | commitment to public health during his six terms in the Texas House |
---|
11 | 11 | | of Representatives and as a longtime member of the Texas Board of |
---|
12 | 12 | | Health, and it is most fitting that he be recognized with the naming |
---|
13 | 13 | | of the Department of State Health Services Laboratory Services |
---|
14 | 14 | | Section building in his honor; and |
---|
15 | 15 | | WHEREAS, Born in Smith County on November 20, 1927, Dr. Glaze |
---|
16 | 16 | | was the son of Ben and Erin Glaze; he served his country in the |
---|
17 | 17 | | United States Merchant Marine and earned a bachelor's degree in |
---|
18 | 18 | | agriculture from Sam Houston State University and a doctor of |
---|
19 | 19 | | chiropractic degree from Texas Chiropractic College; and |
---|
20 | 20 | | WHEREAS, Dr. Glaze represented House District 5 from 1991 to |
---|
21 | 21 | | 2002, during which time he played a key role in securing funding for |
---|
22 | 22 | | the new DSHS laboratory as a member of both the house appropriations |
---|
23 | 23 | | committee and the public health committee, ultimately allowing |
---|
24 | 24 | | state employees to move out of a substandard temporary facility; |
---|
25 | 25 | | and |
---|
26 | 26 | | WHEREAS, In addition, Dr. Glaze served the Texas Board of |
---|
27 | 27 | | Health as chair of its legislative committee, and he worked |
---|
28 | 28 | | diligently at the state and federal levels to obtain funding for |
---|
29 | 29 | | public health initiatives and health care services; he continued to |
---|
30 | 30 | | strive to improve health care and health education as a private |
---|
31 | 31 | | citizen, and he benefited the medical profession as president of |
---|
32 | 32 | | the Texas Chiropractic Association and in other leadership roles; |
---|
33 | 33 | | Dr. Glaze passed away on June 25, 2010, at the age of 82; and |
---|
34 | 34 | | WHEREAS, A dedicated legislator and tireless health care |
---|
35 | 35 | | advocate, Dr. Bob Glaze devoted himself to the well-being of his |
---|
36 | 36 | | fellow Texans, and naming the Department of State Health Services |
---|
37 | 37 | | Laboratory Services Section building in his honor would provide a |
---|
38 | 38 | | lasting tribute to his exceptional contributions; now, therefore, |
---|
39 | 39 | | be it |
---|
40 | 40 | | RESOLVED, That the 82nd Legislature of the State of Texas |
---|
41 | 41 | | hereby recommend the Texas Facilities Commission name the |
---|
42 | 42 | | Department of State Health Services Laboratory Services Section |
---|
43 | 43 | | building at 1100 West 49th Street in Austin the Dr. Bob Glaze |
---|
44 | 44 | | Laboratory Services Section building; and, be it further |
---|
45 | 45 | | RESOLVED, That the secretary of state forward an official |
---|
46 | 46 | | copy of this resolution to the chair and executive director of the |
---|
47 | 47 | | Texas Facilities Commission. |
---|
48 | 48 | | * * * * * |
---|