Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HCR69 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Hopson, Hughes (Senate Sponsor - Eltife) H.C.R. No. 69
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 19, 2011;
 April 26, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; May 10, 2011, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 10, 2011, sent to printer.)


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, The late Dr. Bob Glaze demonstrated a deep
 commitment to public health during his six terms in the Texas House
 of Representatives and as a longtime member of the Texas Board of
 Health, and it is most fitting that he be recognized with the naming
 of the Department of State Health Services Laboratory Services
 Section building in his honor; and
 WHEREAS, Born in Smith County on November 20, 1927, Dr. Glaze
 was the son of Ben and Erin Glaze; he served his country in the
 United States Merchant Marine and earned a bachelor's degree in
 agriculture from Sam Houston State University and a doctor of
 chiropractic degree from Texas Chiropractic College; and
 WHEREAS, Dr. Glaze represented House District 5 from 1991 to
 2002, during which time he played a key role in securing funding for
 the new DSHS laboratory as a member of both the house appropriations
 committee and the public health committee, ultimately allowing
 state employees to move out of a substandard temporary facility;
 and
 WHEREAS, In addition, Dr. Glaze served the Texas Board of
 Health as chair of its legislative committee, and he worked
 diligently at the state and federal levels to obtain funding for
 public health initiatives and health care services; he continued to
 strive to improve health care and health education as a private
 citizen, and he benefited the medical profession as president of
 the Texas Chiropractic Association and in other leadership roles;
 Dr. Glaze passed away on June 25, 2010, at the age of 82; and
 WHEREAS, A dedicated legislator and tireless health care
 advocate, Dr. Bob Glaze devoted himself to the well-being of his
 fellow Texans, and naming the Department of State Health Services
 Laboratory Services Section building in his honor would provide a
 lasting tribute to his exceptional contributions; now, therefore,
 be it
 RESOLVED, That the 82nd Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby recommend the Texas Facilities Commission name the
 Department of State Health Services Laboratory Services Section
 building at 1100 West 49th Street in Austin the Dr. Bob Glaze
 Laboratory Services Section building; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That the secretary of state forward an official
 copy of this resolution to the chair and executive director of the
 Texas Facilities Commission.
 * * * * *