House
|
05/13/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Recommitted to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3690
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3829
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2781
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2548
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2548
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2091
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1292
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1255
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1255
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1255
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1254
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1254
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1254
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1254
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1026
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Referred to Veteran Affairs & Military Instal
|
|
Journal Page: 721
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 721
|
Senate
|
03/11/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|