E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5150
|
E
|
05/25/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3794
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5382
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3430
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3526
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3104
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4803
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4802
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1264
|
Journal Page: 4803
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4803
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4803
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 4770
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4775
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4775
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4185
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3637
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 2256
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2256
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1791
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1163
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1087
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1087
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1087
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1087
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1087
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1087
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1087
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1001
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 902
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 866
|
Senate
|
01/31/2011
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 224
|
Senate
|
01/31/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 224
|
Senate
|
11/18/2010
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/18/2010
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|