E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective in 90 days -- 8/29/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5150
|
E
|
05/24/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3527
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5036
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3102
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3320
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2759
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4696
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1254
|
Journal Page: 4696
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4696
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4695
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4412
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1201
|
Journal Page: 4411
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4411
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Amendment tabled
|
5-Turner and Y. Davis
|
Journal Page: 4405
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4381
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4338
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Referred to Redistricting
|
|
Journal Page: 4118
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 4118
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4124
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2553
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
Journal Page: 2547
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2481
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2479
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2478
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2478
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2478
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2478
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Patrick
|
Journal Page: 2473
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2473
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2473
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2468
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 2468
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Amendment adopted as substituted
|
FA3 Uresti
|
Journal Page: 2457
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Amendment substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2457
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Substitute amendment offered
|
FA4 Uresti
|
Journal Page: 2445
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Amendment tabled
|
|
Journal Page: 2432
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2389
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2389
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2387
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2309
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2011
|
Referred to Redistricting, Select
|
|
Journal Page: 206
|
Senate
|
01/31/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 206
|
Senate
|
01/03/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|