House | 05/12/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/12/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/12/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/12/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/10/2011 | No action taken in committee | ||
House | 05/10/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/10/2011 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 3394 | |
House | 04/28/2011 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 2383 | |
House | 04/28/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2383 | |
House | 03/17/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 903 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 643 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 596 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 596 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 596 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 596 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 596 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 596 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 596 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 506 | |
Senate | 03/07/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/07/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/02/2011 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 266 | |
Senate | 02/02/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 266 | |
Senate | 01/27/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/27/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |