Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB426 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Duncan S.B. No. 426
 (In the Senate - Filed January 27, 2011; February 2, 2011,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 March 8, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; March 8, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the liability of and payment of legal fees for
 court-appointed trustees of certain facilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 242, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 242.0947 to read as follows:
 Sec. 242.0947.  IMMUNITY FROM CIVIL LIABILITY; PAYMENT OF
 CERTAIN LEGAL FEES INCURRED BY TRUSTEE.  (a)  This section applies
 only to a trustee appointed under Section 242.094 to operate:
 (1)  a nursing or convalescent home; or
 (2)  an assisted living facility as authorized under
 Section 247.003(b).
 (b)  A trustee is not liable for civil damages for an act or
 omission committed in good faith in the official scope of the
 trustee's duties.
 (c)  The trustee is entitled to payment for reasonable legal
 fees actually incurred by the trustee in fulfilling the trustee's
 duties.
 (d)  Notwithstanding Section 242.096(b), a trustee of a home
 may use the emergency assistance funds available under Section
 242.096 to pay reasonable legal fees actually incurred by the
 trustee in fulfilling the trustee's duties.  Notwithstanding
 Section 242.096(c), a court may order the department to disburse
 emergency assistance funds to the trustee to pay reasonable legal
 fees actually incurred by the trustee in fulfilling the trustee's
 duties.
 (e)  Notwithstanding Section 242.0965(b), a trustee of an
 assisted living facility may use the emergency assistance funds
 available under Section 242.0965 to pay reasonable legal fees
 actually incurred by the trustee in fulfilling the trustee's
 duties.  Notwithstanding Section 242.0965(c), a court may order the
 department to disburse emergency assistance funds to the trustee to
 pay reasonable legal fees actually incurred by the trustee in
 fulfilling the trustee's duties.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter D, Chapter 252, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 252.0935 to read as follows:
 Sec. 252.0935.  IMMUNITY FROM CIVIL LIABILITY; PAYMENT OF
 CERTAIN LEGAL FEES INCURRED BY TRUSTEE.  (a)  This section applies
 only to a trustee appointed under Section 252.093 to operate a
 facility.
 (b)  A trustee is not liable for civil damages for an act or
 omission committed in good faith in the official scope of the
 trustee's duties.
 (c)  The trustee is entitled to payment for reasonable legal
 fees actually incurred by the trustee in fulfilling the trustee's
 duties.
 (d)  Notwithstanding Section 252.095(c), a trustee may use
 the emergency assistance funds available under Section 252.095 to
 pay reasonable legal fees actually incurred by the trustee in
 fulfilling the trustee's duties.  Notwithstanding Section
 252.095(d), a court may order the department to disburse emergency
 assistance funds to the trustee to pay reasonable legal fees
 actually incurred by the trustee in fulfilling the trustee's
 duties.
 SECTION 3.  (a)  Subsection (b), Section 242.0947, and
 Subsection (b), Section 252.0935, Health and Safety Code, as added
 by this Act, apply only to an act or omission by a trustee that
 occurs on or after the effective date of this Act.  An act or
 omission that occurred before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect immediately before the effective date
 of this Act, and the former law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 (b)  Subsections (c), (d), and (e), Section 242.0947, and
 Subsections (c) and (d), Section 252.0935, Health and Safety Code,
 as added by this Act, apply only to legal fees incurred by a trustee
 on or after the effective date of this Act.  Legal fees incurred by a
 trustee before the effective date of this Act are governed by the
 law in effect when the fees were incurred, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *