House
|
05/24/2011
|
1 hr. notice-for reconsideration
|
|
Journal Page: 5051
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5013
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1342
|
Journal Page: 5013
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Failed to pass to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 5013
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Amended
|
1-J. Davis
|
Journal Page: 5012
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5012
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4185
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 2652
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2652
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2262
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1375
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1326
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1326
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1326
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1326
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1326
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1326
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1326
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 West
|
Journal Page: 1325
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1325
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1325
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1025
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2011
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 414
|
Senate
|
02/23/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 414
|
Senate
|
02/14/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|