Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB681 Latest Draft

Bill / House Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: West S.B. No. 681
 (J. Davis of Harris)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of a task force to study the
 assessments of children in the child welfare system.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 40, Human Resources Code,
 is amended by adding Section 40.074 to read as follows:
 Sec. 40.074.  CHILD WELFARE ASSESSMENT TASK FORCE.  (a)  The
 child welfare assessment task force is established to:
 (1)  study the assessments used by the department to
 determine the appropriate placement, treatment, and service needs
 for a child;
 (2)  develop a list of tools for providers to use when
 conducting behavioral assessments of children in the child welfare
 system; and
 (3)  develop guidelines regarding the contents of
 assessment reports.
 (b)  The task force consists of the following members
 appointed by the executive commissioner:
 (1)  one member from the National Association of Social
 Workers, Texas Chapter;
 (2)  one member from the Texas Foster Family
 Association;
 (3)  one member from the Texas Psychological
 Association;
 (4)  one member who is a member of the department's
 public-private partnership regarding foster care redesign;
 (5)  one member who receives or has received mental
 health services as a foster child;
 (6)  one member who is an advocate for children's
 interests in the child welfare system;
 (7)  one member who is a judge with experience working
 with cases involving child protective services;
 (8)  one member who is a parent with experience in the
 child welfare system;
 (9)  three members who are clinicians with experience
 in, and knowledge of, comprehensive assessments and training in
 trauma-informed assessment and care;
 (10)  one member from the department; and
 (11)  one member from the commission.
 (c)  Each member appointed to the task force must have
 experience and expertise relating to children's behavioral health
 and the study and prevention of child abuse and neglect.
 (d)  The task force shall elect a presiding officer by a vote
 of the membership of the task force.
 (e)  The task force shall meet at the call of the presiding
 officer.
 (f)  Not later than December 1, 2012, the task force shall
 prepare and submit to the commissioner a report containing:
 (1)  a description of the activities of the task force;
 and
 (2)  the findings and recommendations of the task
 force, including:
 (A)  a list of tools for providers to use when
 conducting behavioral assessments of children in the child welfare
 system; and
 (B)  guidelines regarding the contents of
 assessment reports.
 (g)  Not later than September 1, 2013, the department shall
 adopt policies that incorporate the findings and recommendations of
 the task force described by Subsection (f), to the extent that such
 recommendations:
 (1)  are generally accepted standards of practice or
 care for a physician, psychologist, or other professional who would
 conduct the assessment; and
 (2)  can be implemented within existing fiscal
 resources appropriated to the department.
 (h)  This section expires September 1, 2014.
 SECTION 2.  The executive commissioner of the Health and
 Human Services Commission shall make the appointments to the child
 welfare assessment task force created by this Act not later than
 January 1, 2012.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.