1 | 1 | | By: West S.B. No. 681 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (J. Davis of Harris) |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
6 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 7 | | relating to the establishment of a task force to study the |
---|
8 | 8 | | assessments of children in the child welfare system. |
---|
9 | 9 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
10 | 10 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 40, Human Resources Code, |
---|
11 | 11 | | is amended by adding Section 40.074 to read as follows: |
---|
12 | 12 | | Sec. 40.074. CHILD WELFARE ASSESSMENT TASK FORCE. (a) The |
---|
13 | 13 | | child welfare assessment task force is established to: |
---|
14 | 14 | | (1) study the assessments used by the department to |
---|
15 | 15 | | determine the appropriate placement, treatment, and service needs |
---|
16 | 16 | | for a child; |
---|
17 | 17 | | (2) develop a list of tools for providers to use when |
---|
18 | 18 | | conducting behavioral assessments of children in the child welfare |
---|
19 | 19 | | system; and |
---|
20 | 20 | | (3) develop guidelines regarding the contents of |
---|
21 | 21 | | assessment reports. |
---|
22 | 22 | | (b) The task force consists of the following members |
---|
23 | 23 | | appointed by the executive commissioner: |
---|
24 | 24 | | (1) one member from the National Association of Social |
---|
25 | 25 | | Workers, Texas Chapter; |
---|
26 | 26 | | (2) one member from the Texas Foster Family |
---|
27 | 27 | | Association; |
---|
28 | 28 | | (3) one member from the Texas Psychological |
---|
29 | 29 | | Association; |
---|
30 | 30 | | (4) one member who is a member of the department's |
---|
31 | 31 | | public-private partnership regarding foster care redesign; |
---|
32 | 32 | | (5) one member who receives or has received mental |
---|
33 | 33 | | health services as a foster child; |
---|
34 | 34 | | (6) one member who is an advocate for children's |
---|
35 | 35 | | interests in the child welfare system; |
---|
36 | 36 | | (7) one member who is a judge with experience working |
---|
37 | 37 | | with cases involving child protective services; |
---|
38 | 38 | | (8) one member who is a parent with experience in the |
---|
39 | 39 | | child welfare system; |
---|
40 | 40 | | (9) three members who are clinicians with experience |
---|
41 | 41 | | in, and knowledge of, comprehensive assessments and training in |
---|
42 | 42 | | trauma-informed assessment and care; |
---|
43 | 43 | | (10) one member from the department; and |
---|
44 | 44 | | (11) one member from the commission. |
---|
45 | 45 | | (c) Each member appointed to the task force must have |
---|
46 | 46 | | experience and expertise relating to children's behavioral health |
---|
47 | 47 | | and the study and prevention of child abuse and neglect. |
---|
48 | 48 | | (d) The task force shall elect a presiding officer by a vote |
---|
49 | 49 | | of the membership of the task force. |
---|
50 | 50 | | (e) The task force shall meet at the call of the presiding |
---|
51 | 51 | | officer. |
---|
52 | 52 | | (f) Not later than December 1, 2012, the task force shall |
---|
53 | 53 | | prepare and submit to the commissioner a report containing: |
---|
54 | 54 | | (1) a description of the activities of the task force; |
---|
55 | 55 | | and |
---|
56 | 56 | | (2) the findings and recommendations of the task |
---|
57 | 57 | | force, including: |
---|
58 | 58 | | (A) a list of tools for providers to use when |
---|
59 | 59 | | conducting behavioral assessments of children in the child welfare |
---|
60 | 60 | | system; and |
---|
61 | 61 | | (B) guidelines regarding the contents of |
---|
62 | 62 | | assessment reports. |
---|
63 | 63 | | (g) Not later than September 1, 2013, the department shall |
---|
64 | 64 | | adopt policies that incorporate the findings and recommendations of |
---|
65 | 65 | | the task force described by Subsection (f), to the extent that such |
---|
66 | 66 | | recommendations: |
---|
67 | 67 | | (1) are generally accepted standards of practice or |
---|
68 | 68 | | care for a physician, psychologist, or other professional who would |
---|
69 | 69 | | conduct the assessment; and |
---|
70 | 70 | | (2) can be implemented within existing fiscal |
---|
71 | 71 | | resources appropriated to the department. |
---|
72 | 72 | | (h) This section expires September 1, 2014. |
---|
73 | 73 | | SECTION 2. The executive commissioner of the Health and |
---|
74 | 74 | | Human Services Commission shall make the appointments to the child |
---|
75 | 75 | | welfare assessment task force created by this Act not later than |
---|
76 | 76 | | January 1, 2012. |
---|
77 | 77 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
78 | 78 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
79 | 79 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
80 | 80 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
81 | 81 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2011. |
---|