House | 05/13/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/13/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/13/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/13/2011 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Referred to Appropriations | Journal Page: 2382 | |
House | 04/28/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2382 | |
House | 04/06/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1544 | |
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 964 | |
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 923 | |
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 923 | |
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 923 | |
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 922 | |
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 922 | |
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 922 | |
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 922 | |
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 900 | |
Senate | 03/31/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 867 | |
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/14/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/14/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/14/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/14/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/31/2011 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 210 | |
Senate | 01/31/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 210 | |
Senate | 11/08/2010 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/08/2010 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |