1 | 1 | | By: Nelson S.B. No. 73 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Filed November 8, 2010; January 31, 2011, |
---|
3 | 3 | | read first time and referred to Committee on Finance; |
---|
4 | 4 | | March 31, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable Committee |
---|
5 | 5 | | Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 15, Nays 0; March 31, 2011, |
---|
6 | 6 | | sent to printer.) |
---|
7 | 7 | | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 73 By: Nelson |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | |
---|
10 | 10 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
11 | 11 | | AN ACT |
---|
12 | 12 | | relating to debt issuance authority of and funding for the Cancer |
---|
13 | 13 | | Prevention and Research Institute of Texas. |
---|
14 | 14 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
15 | 15 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 1232, Government Code, is |
---|
16 | 16 | | amended by adding Section 1232.1221 to read as follows: |
---|
17 | 17 | | Sec. 1232.1221. COMMENCEMENT OF CERTAIN MULTIYEAR |
---|
18 | 18 | | CANCER-RELATED PROJECTS. (a) Funds may be distributed to a grant |
---|
19 | 19 | | recipient for a multiyear project for which an award is granted by |
---|
20 | 20 | | the Cancer Prevention and Research Institute of Texas Oversight |
---|
21 | 21 | | Committee as authorized by Section 102.257, Health and Safety Code, |
---|
22 | 22 | | after the authority has certified that obligations in an amount |
---|
23 | 23 | | sufficient to pay the money needed to fund the project have been |
---|
24 | 24 | | authorized for issuance by the authority and approved by the Bond |
---|
25 | 25 | | Review Board. |
---|
26 | 26 | | (b) After issuing the obligations, the board shall: |
---|
27 | 27 | | (1) pay the costs of the issuance and any related bond |
---|
28 | 28 | | administrative costs of the authority; |
---|
29 | 29 | | (2) certify to the Cancer Prevention and Research |
---|
30 | 30 | | Institute of Texas and to the comptroller that the proceeds from the |
---|
31 | 31 | | issuance are available; and |
---|
32 | 32 | | (3) deposit the proceeds into the state treasury to be |
---|
33 | 33 | | credited to the account of the Cancer Prevention and Research |
---|
34 | 34 | | Institute of Texas. |
---|
35 | 35 | | SECTION 2. Subsections (b) and (c), Section 102.201, Health |
---|
36 | 36 | | and Safety Code, are amended to read as follows: |
---|
37 | 37 | | (b) The cancer prevention and research fund consists of: |
---|
38 | 38 | | (1) patent, royalty, and license fees and other income |
---|
39 | 39 | | received under a contract entered into as provided by Section |
---|
40 | 40 | | 102.255; |
---|
41 | 41 | | (2) appropriations of money to the fund by the |
---|
42 | 42 | | legislature, except that the appropriated money may not include the |
---|
43 | 43 | | proceeds from the issuance of bonds authorized by Section 67, |
---|
44 | 44 | | Article III, Texas Constitution; |
---|
45 | 45 | | (3) gifts, grants, including grants from the federal |
---|
46 | 46 | | government, and other donations received for the fund; and |
---|
47 | 47 | | (4) interest earned on the investment of money in the |
---|
48 | 48 | | fund. |
---|
49 | 49 | | (c) The fund may be used only to pay for: |
---|
50 | 50 | | (1) grants for cancer research and for cancer research |
---|
51 | 51 | | facilities in this state to realize therapies, protocols, and |
---|
52 | 52 | | medical procedures for the cure or substantial mitigation of all |
---|
53 | 53 | | types of cancer in humans; |
---|
54 | 54 | | (2) the purchase, subject to approval by the |
---|
55 | 55 | | institute, of laboratory facilities by or on behalf of a state |
---|
56 | 56 | | agency or grant recipient; |
---|
57 | 57 | | (3) grants to public or private persons to implement |
---|
58 | 58 | | the Texas Cancer Plan; |
---|
59 | 59 | | (4) the operation of the institute; [and] |
---|
60 | 60 | | (5) grants for cancer prevention and control programs |
---|
61 | 61 | | in this state to mitigate the incidence of all types of cancer in |
---|
62 | 62 | | humans; and |
---|
63 | 63 | | (6) debt service on bonds issued as authorized by |
---|
64 | 64 | | Section 67, Article III, Texas Constitution. |
---|
65 | 65 | | SECTION 3. Section 102.257, Health and Safety Code, is |
---|
66 | 66 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
67 | 67 | | Sec. 102.257. MULTIYEAR PROJECTS. The oversight committee |
---|
68 | 68 | | may grant funds for a multiyear project. The oversight committee |
---|
69 | 69 | | must specify the total amount of [All the] money approved [needed] |
---|
70 | 70 | | to fund the [a] multiyear project. The total amount specified is |
---|
71 | 71 | | considered for purposes of Section 102.253 to have been [must be] |
---|
72 | 72 | | awarded in the state fiscal year that the project is approved by the |
---|
73 | 73 | | research and prevention programs committee. The institute shall |
---|
74 | 74 | | distribute only the money that will be expended during that fiscal |
---|
75 | 75 | | year. The institute may maintain the remaining money needed in each |
---|
76 | 76 | | subsequent fiscal year [shall be maintained] in an escrow account |
---|
77 | 77 | | to be distributed by the institute as the money is needed [in |
---|
78 | 78 | | subsequent years of the project]. |
---|
79 | 79 | | SECTION 4. The changes in law made by this Act apply only to |
---|
80 | 80 | | a grant of funds for a multiyear project by the Cancer Prevention |
---|
81 | 81 | | and Research Institute of Texas Oversight Committee as authorized |
---|
82 | 82 | | by Section 102.257, Health and Safety Code, as amended by this Act, |
---|
83 | 83 | | made on or after June 1, 2011. A grant of funds for a multiyear |
---|
84 | 84 | | project made before that date is governed by the law in effect on |
---|
85 | 85 | | the date the grant was made, and the former law is continued in |
---|
86 | 86 | | effect for that purpose. |
---|
87 | 87 | | SECTION 5. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
88 | 88 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
89 | 89 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
90 | 90 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
91 | 91 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2011. |
---|
92 | 92 | | * * * * * |
---|