Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB73 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Nelson S.B. No. 73
 (In the Senate - Filed November 8, 2010; January 31, 2011,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 March 31, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 15, Nays 0; March 31, 2011,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 73 By:  Nelson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to debt issuance authority of and funding for the Cancer
 Prevention and Research Institute of Texas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 1232, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1232.1221 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1232.1221.  COMMENCEMENT OF CERTAIN MULTIYEAR
 CANCER-RELATED PROJECTS. (a)  Funds may be distributed to a grant
 recipient for a multiyear project for which an award is granted by
 the Cancer Prevention and Research Institute of Texas Oversight
 Committee as authorized by Section 102.257, Health and Safety Code,
 after the authority has certified that obligations in an amount
 sufficient to pay the money needed to fund the project have been
 authorized for issuance by the authority and approved by the Bond
 Review Board.
 (b)  After issuing the obligations, the board shall:
 (1)  pay the costs of the issuance and any related bond
 administrative costs of the authority;
 (2)  certify to the Cancer Prevention and Research
 Institute of Texas and to the comptroller that the proceeds from the
 issuance are available; and
 (3)  deposit the proceeds into the state treasury to be
 credited to the account of the Cancer Prevention and Research
 Institute of Texas.
 SECTION 2.  Subsections (b) and (c), Section 102.201, Health
 and Safety Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The cancer prevention and research fund consists of:
 (1)  patent, royalty, and license fees and other income
 received under a contract entered into as provided by Section
 102.255;
 (2)  appropriations of money to the fund by the
 legislature, except that the appropriated money may not include the
 proceeds from the issuance of bonds authorized by Section 67,
 Article III, Texas Constitution;
 (3)  gifts, grants, including grants from the federal
 government, and other donations received for the fund; and
 (4)  interest earned on the investment of money in the
 fund.
 (c)  The fund may be used only to pay for:
 (1)  grants for cancer research and for cancer research
 facilities in this state to realize therapies, protocols, and
 medical procedures for the cure or substantial mitigation of all
 types of cancer in humans;
 (2)  the purchase, subject to approval by the
 institute, of laboratory facilities by or on behalf of a state
 agency or grant recipient;
 (3)  grants to public or private persons to implement
 the Texas Cancer Plan;
 (4)  the operation of the institute; [and]
 (5)  grants for cancer prevention and control programs
 in this state to mitigate the incidence of all types of cancer in
 humans; and
 (6)  debt service on bonds issued as authorized by
 Section 67, Article III, Texas Constitution.
 SECTION 3.  Section 102.257, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 102.257.  MULTIYEAR PROJECTS.  The oversight committee
 may grant funds for a multiyear project. The oversight committee
 must specify the total amount of [All the] money approved [needed]
 to fund the [a] multiyear project. The total amount specified is
 considered for purposes of Section 102.253 to have been [must be]
 awarded in the state fiscal year that the project is approved by the
 research and prevention programs committee. The institute shall
 distribute only the money that will be expended during that fiscal
 year. The institute may maintain the remaining money needed in each
 subsequent fiscal year [shall be maintained] in an escrow account
 to be distributed by the institute as the money is needed [in
 subsequent years of the project].
 SECTION 4.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a grant of funds for a multiyear project by the Cancer Prevention
 and Research Institute of Texas Oversight Committee as authorized
 by Section 102.257, Health and Safety Code, as amended by this Act,
 made on or after June 1, 2011. A grant of funds for a multiyear
 project made before that date is governed by the law in effect on
 the date the grant was made, and the former law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *