House | 04/11/2011 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 1659 | |
House | 04/11/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1659 | |
House | 03/10/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 771 | |
Senate | 03/09/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 525 | |
Senate | 03/09/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 512 | |
Senate | 03/09/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 512 | |
Senate | 03/09/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 512 | |
Senate | 03/09/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 512 | |
Senate | 03/09/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 512 | |
Senate | 03/09/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 512 | |
Senate | 03/09/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 511 | |
Senate | 03/09/2011 | Rules suspended-Constitutional 60-Day | Journal Page: 511 | |
Senate | 03/09/2011 | Rules suspended-Intent Calendar | Journal Page: 511 | |
Senate | 03/09/2011 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/07/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 485 | |
Senate | 03/02/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/02/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 477 | |
Senate | 03/01/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/01/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/01/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/28/2011 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 437 | |
Senate | 02/28/2011 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 436 | |
Senate | 02/28/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 436 | |
Senate | 02/24/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/24/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |