Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB912 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: West, et al. S.B. No. 912
 (In the Senate - Filed February 24, 2011; February 28, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education; March 2, 2011,
 reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0;
 March 2, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to temporary modification under certain circumstances of
 procedures authorized for the nonrenewal of public school teacher
 term contracts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter E, Chapter 21, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 21.2071 to read as follows:
 Sec. 21.2071.  NONRENEWAL HEARING UNDER TERM CONTRACT;
 REDUCTION IN PERSONNEL OR PROGRAM CHANGE. (a)  Notwithstanding any
 other provision of this chapter, the board of trustees of a school
 district may hold or provide for a hearing under this section if the
 board orders a reduction in personnel on the basis of, as determined
 by the board, financial exigency or a program change.
 (b)  If a teacher desires a hearing after receiving notice of
 the proposed nonrenewal of the teacher's term contract under
 Section 21.206, the teacher shall notify the board of trustees of
 the school district in writing not later than the 30th day after the
 date the teacher receives the notice of the proposed nonrenewal.  A
 hearing held by the board under this section or held by the board's
 designee under Subsection (d) must be held not later than the 15th
 day after the date the board receives the request for a hearing
 unless the parties agree in writing to a different date.
 (c)  A hearing held by the board of trustees under this
 section or held by the board's designee under Subsection (d) must
 be:
 (1)  closed unless the teacher requests an open
 hearing; and
 (2)  conducted in accordance with rules adopted by the
 board.
 (d)  The board of trustees may designate an attorney licensed
 to practice law in this state to hold the hearing on behalf of the
 board, to create a hearing record for the board's consideration and
 action, and to recommend an action to the board. The attorney
 serving as the board's designee may not be employed by a school
 district, and neither the designee nor a law firm with which the
 designee is associated may be serving as an agent or representative
 of a school district, of a teacher in a dispute between a district
 and a teacher, or of an organization of school employees, school
 administrators, or school boards of trustees. Not later than the
 15th day after the completion of the hearing under this subsection,
 the board's designee shall provide to the board a record of the
 hearing and the designee's recommendation of whether the contract
 should be renewed or not renewed. The board shall consider the
 record of the hearing and the designee's recommendation at the
 first board meeting for which notice can be posted in compliance
 with Chapter 551, Government Code, following the receipt of the
 record and recommendation from the board's designee, unless the
 parties agree in writing to a different date.  At the meeting, the
 board shall consider the hearing record and the designee's
 recommendation and allow each party to present an oral argument to
 the board.  The board by written policy may limit the amount of time
 for oral argument.  The policy must provide equal time for each
 party.  The board may obtain advice concerning legal matters from an
 attorney who has not been involved in the proceedings.  The board
 may accept, reject, or modify the designee's recommendation.  The
 board shall notify the teacher in writing of the board's decision
 not later than the 15th day after the date of the meeting.
 (e)  At a hearing under this section, the teacher may:
 (1)  be represented by a representative of the
 teacher's choice;
 (2)  hear the evidence supporting the reason for
 nonrenewal;
 (3)  cross-examine adverse witnesses; and
 (4)  present evidence.
 (f)  Notwithstanding any other provision of this section, in
 lieu of the board of trustees holding a hearing under this section
 or designating an attorney to hold a hearing under Subsection (d),
 the board may use the process established under Subchapter F.
 (g)  This section expires December 31, 2011.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *