1 | 1 | | By: West, et al. S.B. No. 912 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Filed February 24, 2011; February 28, 2011, read |
---|
3 | 3 | | first time and referred to Committee on Education; March 2, 2011, |
---|
4 | 4 | | reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; |
---|
5 | 5 | | March 2, 2011, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
9 | 9 | | AN ACT |
---|
10 | 10 | | relating to temporary modification under certain circumstances of |
---|
11 | 11 | | procedures authorized for the nonrenewal of public school teacher |
---|
12 | 12 | | term contracts. |
---|
13 | 13 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
14 | 14 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter E, Chapter 21, Education Code, is |
---|
15 | 15 | | amended by adding Section 21.2071 to read as follows: |
---|
16 | 16 | | Sec. 21.2071. NONRENEWAL HEARING UNDER TERM CONTRACT; |
---|
17 | 17 | | REDUCTION IN PERSONNEL OR PROGRAM CHANGE. (a) Notwithstanding any |
---|
18 | 18 | | other provision of this chapter, the board of trustees of a school |
---|
19 | 19 | | district may hold or provide for a hearing under this section if the |
---|
20 | 20 | | board orders a reduction in personnel on the basis of, as determined |
---|
21 | 21 | | by the board, financial exigency or a program change. |
---|
22 | 22 | | (b) If a teacher desires a hearing after receiving notice of |
---|
23 | 23 | | the proposed nonrenewal of the teacher's term contract under |
---|
24 | 24 | | Section 21.206, the teacher shall notify the board of trustees of |
---|
25 | 25 | | the school district in writing not later than the 30th day after the |
---|
26 | 26 | | date the teacher receives the notice of the proposed nonrenewal. A |
---|
27 | 27 | | hearing held by the board under this section or held by the board's |
---|
28 | 28 | | designee under Subsection (d) must be held not later than the 15th |
---|
29 | 29 | | day after the date the board receives the request for a hearing |
---|
30 | 30 | | unless the parties agree in writing to a different date. |
---|
31 | 31 | | (c) A hearing held by the board of trustees under this |
---|
32 | 32 | | section or held by the board's designee under Subsection (d) must |
---|
33 | 33 | | be: |
---|
34 | 34 | | (1) closed unless the teacher requests an open |
---|
35 | 35 | | hearing; and |
---|
36 | 36 | | (2) conducted in accordance with rules adopted by the |
---|
37 | 37 | | board. |
---|
38 | 38 | | (d) The board of trustees may designate an attorney licensed |
---|
39 | 39 | | to practice law in this state to hold the hearing on behalf of the |
---|
40 | 40 | | board, to create a hearing record for the board's consideration and |
---|
41 | 41 | | action, and to recommend an action to the board. The attorney |
---|
42 | 42 | | serving as the board's designee may not be employed by a school |
---|
43 | 43 | | district, and neither the designee nor a law firm with which the |
---|
44 | 44 | | designee is associated may be serving as an agent or representative |
---|
45 | 45 | | of a school district, of a teacher in a dispute between a district |
---|
46 | 46 | | and a teacher, or of an organization of school employees, school |
---|
47 | 47 | | administrators, or school boards of trustees. Not later than the |
---|
48 | 48 | | 15th day after the completion of the hearing under this subsection, |
---|
49 | 49 | | the board's designee shall provide to the board a record of the |
---|
50 | 50 | | hearing and the designee's recommendation of whether the contract |
---|
51 | 51 | | should be renewed or not renewed. The board shall consider the |
---|
52 | 52 | | record of the hearing and the designee's recommendation at the |
---|
53 | 53 | | first board meeting for which notice can be posted in compliance |
---|
54 | 54 | | with Chapter 551, Government Code, following the receipt of the |
---|
55 | 55 | | record and recommendation from the board's designee, unless the |
---|
56 | 56 | | parties agree in writing to a different date. At the meeting, the |
---|
57 | 57 | | board shall consider the hearing record and the designee's |
---|
58 | 58 | | recommendation and allow each party to present an oral argument to |
---|
59 | 59 | | the board. The board by written policy may limit the amount of time |
---|
60 | 60 | | for oral argument. The policy must provide equal time for each |
---|
61 | 61 | | party. The board may obtain advice concerning legal matters from an |
---|
62 | 62 | | attorney who has not been involved in the proceedings. The board |
---|
63 | 63 | | may accept, reject, or modify the designee's recommendation. The |
---|
64 | 64 | | board shall notify the teacher in writing of the board's decision |
---|
65 | 65 | | not later than the 15th day after the date of the meeting. |
---|
66 | 66 | | (e) At a hearing under this section, the teacher may: |
---|
67 | 67 | | (1) be represented by a representative of the |
---|
68 | 68 | | teacher's choice; |
---|
69 | 69 | | (2) hear the evidence supporting the reason for |
---|
70 | 70 | | nonrenewal; |
---|
71 | 71 | | (3) cross-examine adverse witnesses; and |
---|
72 | 72 | | (4) present evidence. |
---|
73 | 73 | | (f) Notwithstanding any other provision of this section, in |
---|
74 | 74 | | lieu of the board of trustees holding a hearing under this section |
---|
75 | 75 | | or designating an attorney to hold a hearing under Subsection (d), |
---|
76 | 76 | | the board may use the process established under Subchapter F. |
---|
77 | 77 | | (g) This section expires December 31, 2011. |
---|
78 | 78 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
79 | 79 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
80 | 80 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
81 | 81 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
82 | 82 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2011. |
---|
83 | 83 | | * * * * * |
---|