Senate | 04/06/2011 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/31/2011 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/29/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 806 | |
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 790 | |
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 698 | |
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 499 | |
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 499 | |
Senate | 02/25/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/25/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |