Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB949 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Ellis S.B. No. 949
 (In the Senate - Filed February 25, 2011; March 8, 2011,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Education;
 March 28, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 1, 1 present not
 voting; March 28, 2011, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 949 By:  West


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the first day of instruction in certain school
 districts that provide additional days of instruction financed with
 local funds.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (a), Section 25.0811, Education Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by this section, a [A] school
 district may not begin instruction for students for a school year
 before the fourth Monday in August. A school district may:
 (1)  begin instruction for students for a school year
 before the fourth Monday in August if [unless] the district
 operates a year-round system under Section 25.084; or
 (2)  begin instruction for students for a school year
 on or after the first Monday in August at a campus or at not more
 than 20 percent of the campuses in the district if:
 (A)  the district has a student enrollment of
 150,000 or more;
 (B)  the district at the beginning of the school
 year provides, financed with local funds, days of instruction for
 students at the campus or at each of the multiple campuses, in
 addition to the minimum number of days of instruction required
 under Section 25.081;
 (C)  the campus or each of the multiple campuses
 are undergoing comprehensive reform, as determined by the board of
 trustees of the district; and
 (D)  a majority of the students at the campus or at
 each of the multiple campuses are educationally disadvantaged.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *