E | 04/10/2013 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 04/10/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1531 | |
E | 04/02/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1225 | |
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 676 | |
House | 04/02/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 1201 | |
House | 04/01/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1202 | |
House | 04/01/2013 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 1183 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 649 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 649 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 649 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 649 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 649 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 649 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 649 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 609 | |
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 569 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 569 | |
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 550 | |
House | 03/20/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 964 | |
House | 03/20/2013 | Record vote | RV#75 | Journal Page: 854 |
House | 03/20/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 854 | |
House | 03/20/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 854 | |
House | 03/19/2013 | Record vote | RV#72 | Journal Page: 810 |
House | 03/19/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 810 | |
House | 03/19/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 810 | |
House | 03/19/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/08/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/08/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/07/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 693 | |
House | 03/04/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/04/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/04/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 02/25/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 02/25/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 02/25/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 02/25/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/18/2013 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 410 | |
House | 02/18/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 410 | |
House | 02/13/2013 | Filed |