Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1263 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Lewis (Senate Sponsor - Duncan) H.B. No. 1263
 (In the Senate - Received from the House March 20, 2013;
 March 21, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; March 25, 2013, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; March 25, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the delay in the implementation of the abolishment of
 small claims courts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 5.07, Chapter 3 (H.B. 79), Acts of the
 82nd Legislature, 1st Called Session, 2011, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 5.07.  Not later than May 1, 2013, the Texas Supreme
 Court shall promulgate the following rules, to be effective August
 31, 2013:
 (1)  rules to define cases that constitute small claims
 cases;
 (2)  rules of civil procedure applicable to small
 claims cases as required by Section 27.060, Government Code, as
 added by this article; and
 (3)  rules for eviction proceedings.
 SECTION 2.  Section 5.09, Chapter 3 (H.B. 79), Acts of the
 82nd Legislature, 1st Called Session, 2011, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 5.09.  Sections 5.02 and 5.06 of this article take
 effect August 31 [May 1], 2013.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *